WOMEN'S HEALTH CONCERN LIMITED

Charity number: 279651
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY IS A CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE LINE AND EMAIL ADVISORY SERVICE FOR WOMEN OF ALL AGES THROUGHOUT THE UK WHO SEEK INDEPENDENT, UNBIASED PROFESSIONAL INFORMATION ON GYNAECOLOGICAL, HORMONAL, SEXUAL HEALTH AND OTHER MEDICAL CONDITIONS. THE WEBSITE OFFERS AN INCREASINGLY WIDE RANGE OF INFORMATION. EVENTS AND WORKSHOPS ARE HELD FOR HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £892
Total expenditure: £3,591

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 May 1980: Standard registration
  • 13 May 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 13 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1015144 BRITISH MENOPAUSE SOCIETY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £538 £407 £1.96k £212 £892
Total expenditure £950 £0 £0 £0 £3.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 September 2024 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window