DDRC HEALTHCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of safer diving practices and of the wider applications of hyperbaric oxygen in general medicine through service delivery, awareness raising, training and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,473,849
Donations and legacies | £13.78k | |
Charitable activities | £1.72m | |
Other trading activities | £501.62k | |
Investments | £236.96k | |
Other | £6.15k |
Total expenditure:
£2,183,564
Raising funds | £334.38k | |
Charitable activities | £1.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,683,839 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £334.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.85m | |
Retained for future use | £290.29k |
People

51 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 14 March 1980: Standard registration
- DDRC (Working name)
- DIVING DISEASES RESEARCH CENTRE (Previous name)
- DIVING DISEASES RESEARCH CENTRE (Previous name)
- DIVING DISEASES RESEARCH CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Lunn | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhodri Davey | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Chubb | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|||||
PETER ATKEY | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Montgomerie Chapman | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Sparrow | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Clargo | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS GAVIN ANTHONY | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.16m | £1.77m | £2.42m | £2.37m | £2.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91m | £2.17m | £1.96m | £2.08m | £2.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.63m | £1.55m | £1.59m | £1.65m | £1.68m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £17.29k | £11.57k | £12.81k | £18.45k | £13.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £454.28k | £174.73k | £461.87k | £428.09k | £501.62k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.68m | £1.56m | £1.60m | £1.66m | £1.72m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.89k | £9.45k | £230.83k | £245.04k | £236.96k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £16.79k | £113.43k | £19.22k | £6.15k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.69m | £1.97m | £1.70m | £1.80m | £1.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £216.68k | £194.42k | £268.19k | £280.01k | £334.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £44.65k | £48.98k | £63.61k | £66.04k | £55.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.85m | £2.84m | £2.96m | £2.83m | £2.78m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4 | £1.62m | £1.62m | £1.62m | £1.62m | |
|
Other assets | £1.74m | £425.16k | £1.04m | £1.35m | £1.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £591.20k | £1.28m | £1.56m | £1.46m | £1.31m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/08/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY: (A) THE CONDUCT OF SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO (I) THE EFFECT UPON THE HUMAN BODY OF EXPOSURE TO ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENTS, AND (II) UNDERWATER DIVING SAFETY, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (B) THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MEDICAL CONDITIONS ARISING FROM EXPOSURE TO AN ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT; (C) THE ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT TREATMENT OF ILLNESS, DISABILITY OR INJURY; (D) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT TREATMENT, PROCEDURES AND CARE; AND (E) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE EFFECTS UPON THE HUMAN BODY OF EXPOSURE TO ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENTS. IN THESE OBJECTS 'ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT' MEANS ANY ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH PRESSURE DIFFERS FROM THAT AT SEA LEVEL, AND/OR THE CONSTITUENT GASES DIFFER IN NATURE FROM THOSE PRESENT IN AIR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DDRC Healthcare
HYPERBARIC MEDICAL CENTRE
8 RESEARCH WAY
DERRIFORD
PLYMOUTH
PL6 8BU
- Phone:
- 01752209999
- Email:
- info@ddrc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window