MARGARET MORRIS MOVEMENT INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Company is principally engaged in the promotion of dance, physical training and education for persons of all ages whether able or with disabilities to help them to improve their physical, mental and spiritual capacity so they realise their full potential as individuals and members of society and their condition of life may be improved through the system of training evolved by Margaret Morris.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 March 1980: Standard registration
- MMM MOVEMENT THERAPY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Fay Benson | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Norma Long | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Berthe Marie Therese Jayet | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Levy | Trustee | 10 June 2016 |
|
|||||
DENISE JUDITH AVENT | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Goldberger | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dawn Harper | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARY JEAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.31k | £18.73k | £30.57k | £68.46k | £64.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.71k | £40.67k | £58.99k | £128.64k | £134.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/09/2015 as amended on 12 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM PERSONS BY MOVEMENT THERAPY ACCORDING TO THE SYSTEMS EVOLVED BY MARGARET MORRIS AND KNOWN AS "MARGARET MORRIS MOVEMENT." 2. TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS BY "MARGARET MORRIS MOVEMENT" AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFULL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brook Cottage
Buildwas
Shropshire
TF8 7DA
- Phone:
- 01952 433738
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window