THE DOROTHY PORTEOUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes small grants to individuals for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR KEITH WINSTON CLEMENTS | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN MICHAEL MORRIS WEST | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174 | £146 | £117 | £186 | £146 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £545 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 March 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF CHRISTIAN SERVICE. B) TO ASSIST ANY MINISTER STUDENT OR OTHER PRSON WHOSE FURTHER WORK IN CHRISTIAN SERVICE WOULD BE STIMULATED BY SUPPORTING HIS TRAINING. C) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF CHRISTIAN SERVICE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 SUSSEX PLACE
BRISTOL
BS2 9QW
- Phone:
- 07796228836
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window