Financial history THE BUCKTON AND RICE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 280414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £638 £621 £705 £931 £1.60k
Total expenditure £500 £0 £620 £636 £1.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A