THE ISLE OF WIGHT RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a 5 mile heritage steam railway on a part of the former Ryde to Newport railway line.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,161,268
Donations and legacies | £671.07k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other trading activities | £1.12m | |
Investments | £31.81k | |
Other | £46.64k |
Total expenditure:
£2,741,577
Raising funds | £1.29m | |
Charitable activities | £1.45m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.29m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.45m | |
Retained for future use | £419.69k |
People

42 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
430 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 13 November 1981: Standard registration
- ISLE OF WIGHT STEAM RAILWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER TAYLOR | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Ian Price | Trustee | 18 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Laird | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Joy Pardington | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Flynn | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Denis Woodhams | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Carole Denise Buckman | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Isaac Matthew Farnbank | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Deegan | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ton Barry | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HYATT SMITH | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICK FELTON | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
STUART DUDDY | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAIN EDWIN WHITLAM | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL OATES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42m | £1.46m | £2.56m | £2.68m | £3.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12m | £1.53m | £1.97m | £2.37m | £2.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £294.81k | £27.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £552.14k | £606.79k | £350.35k | £437.59k | £671.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £833.78k | £444.01k | £1.03m | £1.02m | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £409.82k | £1.10m | £1.20m | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £351.44k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.70k | £862 | £387 | £3.70k | £31.81k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.83k | £2.22k | £90.25k | £17.43k | £46.64k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £344.13k | £11.71k | £58.25k | £205.32k | £427.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.17m | £923.65k | £987.09k | £1.27m | £1.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £618.73k | £605.64k | £982.05k | £1.10m | £1.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.11k | £7.03k | £85.41k | £72.22k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £336.42k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.54m | £2.84m | £2.88m | £3.07m | £3.30m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.61k | £2.92k | £1.98k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.92m | £1.80m | £2.37m | £2.33m | £2.61m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £108.38k | £348.63k | £363.79k | £148.34k | £239.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 AUG 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUN 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF RAILWAY LOCOMOTION ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISLE OF WIGHT RAILWAY CO LTD
THE RAILWAY STATION
STATION ROAD
HAVENSTREET
RYDE
PO33 4DS
- Phone:
- 01983882204
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window