THE SUSSEX THEATRE ORGAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO CONSERVE, MAINTAIN AND PROMOTE THE USE OF THE WORTHING WURLITZER ORGAN INSTALLED IN THE ASSEMBLY HALL WORTHING. PROMOTION OF THEATRE ORGAN CONCERTS WITH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ARTISTES OF THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS. ONGOING MAINTENANCE TO PRESERVE THE CAPABILITY OF THE ORGAN TO THE FINEST STANDARDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 October 1980: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 October 2011: Re-registered
- SUSSEX THEATRE ORGAN TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Roderick Field | Chair | 20 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Darren John Riding | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE JANE FIELD | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £3.47k | £14.33k | £20.63k | £19.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.94k | £3.93k | £13.59k | £21.49k | £19.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1977 as amended on 02 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO CONSERVE MAINTAIN AND PROMOTE THE USE OF THE WURLITZER THEATRE ORGAN PREVIOUSLY MANUFACTURED FOR AND INSTALLED IN THE TROXY THEATRE, LONDON BUT NOW INSTALLED IN THE ASSEMBLY HALL, WORTHING, WEST SUSSEX.
Area of benefit
WORTHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE QUILLET
CORFE LODGE ROAD
BROADSTONE
BH18 9NF
- Phone:
- 01202600300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window