CHELTENHAM MUSIC FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further and promote the work of the Cheltenham Music Festival
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 08 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW HOWARD AUSTER | Chair | 10 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
TERRY KIRKHOPE | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Manuel Beard | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.24k | £6.55k | £8.38k | £6.02k | £6.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.84k | £167 | £11.88k | £20.44k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/09/1980 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHELTENHAM MUSIC FESTIVAL WHICH IS PART OF THE ACTIVITY OF CHELTENHAM FESTIVALS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARROW HILL HOUSE
BARROW HILL
CHURCHDOWN
GLOUCESTER
GL3 2LW
- Phone:
- 01452713479
- Email:
- cmfsmembership@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window