HCPT (HOSANNA HOUSE AND CHILDREN'S PILGRIMAGE TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering children and adults with disabilities pilgrimage holidays to Lourdes, France.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£3,752,022
Donations and legacies | £1.03m | |
Charitable activities | £1.79m | |
Other trading activities | £842.95k | |
Investments | £87.29k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,315,798
Raising funds | £757.74k | |
Charitable activities | £4.56m | |
Other | £0 |
-£259,041 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £757.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.56m |
People

16 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
3800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Scotland
Governance
- HCPT (Working name)
- HCPT - THE PILGRIMAGE TRUST (Previous name)
- HCPT PILGRIMAGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Emma Jane Derby | Chair | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona McCormack | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare O'Brien | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Kearney | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Father Damian Cassidy | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlie O'Sullivan | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Adi Pandole | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John O'Dowd-Booth | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Reid | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Helen Young | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Righton | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.75m | £1.70m | £1.80m | £2.00m | £3.75m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55m | £1.60m | £1.38m | £2.56m | £5.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.94m | £1.06m | £1.22m | £931.45k | £1.03m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £735.15k | £585.12k | £477.65k | £382.90k | £842.95k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.03m | £14.76k | £36.59k | £614.87k | £1.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £49.72k | £46.63k | £62.49k | £67.47k | £87.29k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00m | £520.49k | £895.99k | £674.85k | £413.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.95m | £1.23m | £1.04m | £2.14m | £4.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £601.82k | £366.97k | £338.66k | £421.95k | £757.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £81.08k | £75.16k | £49.10k | £53.91k | £87.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £27.24k | £29.84k | £36.37k | £38.56k | £32.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.21m | £1.33m | £1.24m | £1.21m | £1.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.02m | £4.20m | £4.92m | £4.79m | £3.28m | |
|
Other assets | £1.61m | £1.92m | £2.25m | £1.65m | £1.31m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £201.20k | £491.93k | £364.58k | £355.51k | £295.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/02/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/08/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/05/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE TAKING OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE TAKING OF, DISABLED CHILDREN AND ADULTS ON PILGRIMAGE TO LOURDES OR SUCH OTHER PLACE OF PILGRIMAGE AS THE CHARITY MAY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE WITH THE PURPOSE OF ENRICHING THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
H C P T
Oakfield Park
32 Bilton Road
Rugby
CV22 7HQ
- Phone:
- 01788564646
- Email:
- hq@hcpt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window