THE JEWISH COUNCIL FOR RACIAL EQUALITY (JCORE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JCORE's mission is to work with the Jewish and wider communities to promote a positive multi-ethnic UK free from all forms of racism. Our work has three strands: a) Providing Race Equality Education; b) Promoting the needs of asylum seekers and refugees c) Promoting Black, Asian, Jewish dialogue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1980: Standard registration
- 01 December 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 December 2011: Funds transferred to 1132666 HIAS+JCORE
- J C O R E (Working name)
- JCORE (Working name)
- THE JEWISH SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.54k | £147.38k | £107.49k | £212.67k | £144.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.43k | £136.21k | £139.75k | £144.84k | £178.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 24 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 24 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 16 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 16 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 20 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 20 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 12 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 12 October 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED DATED 7 OCTOBER 1980, AS AMENDED 6TH JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THAT OF THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES WHICH ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window