THE FRIENDS OF HOLLAND PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the preservation, protection and improvement of Holland Park as a place of historic and ecological interest and beauty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 14 November 1980: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF HOLLAND PARK (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER ANNE KETTLEWELL | Chair | 04 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Isabelle Beaumont | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
FEI PHILIP HOU | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
SILVI SPASSOV | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA FRENCH | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM GEORGE RAYMOND FRANKLIN | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOY ELIZABETH PURITZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
RHODDY WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL JOHN WILLIAM BROCKMANN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.63k | £98.96k | £59.55k | £71.09k | £67.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.25k | £44.94k | £95.17k | £59.37k | £72.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED 12 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FRIENDS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT;- (1) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF HOLLAND PARK ('THE PARK') AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ECOLOGICAL INTEREST AND BEAUTY (2) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL PLANT, ANIMAL AND BIRD LIFE OF THE PARK AND, IN PARTICULAR, ITS RETENTION AS A NATURAL WOODLAND HABITAT FOR WILD LIFE; (3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND OTHER ASPECTS OF THE PARK.
Area of benefit
HOLLAND PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 KINGSBRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
W10 6PU
- Phone:
- 02089696469
- Email:
- nigel@brockpeople.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window