THE GLOUCESTER AND BRISTOL DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and encourage full-circle church bell ringing. Provide financial support to appropriate belfry restoration projects in affiliated churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 November 1980: Standard registration
- G AND B D A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Haynes | Chair | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Lazenby | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ANNE HARTLEY | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Knight | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon William Edwards | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Bulteel | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Blandon | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Kinghorn Cooper | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Austen While | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gregory James Mulford Jones | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Holliday | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Emily Gittings | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tom Edgeworth | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Povey | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|||||
JENNI JUDSON | Trustee | 12 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR R CLIVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK JOHN HARBOTTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR P TWENTYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANDREW IRVING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BILL NASH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK BRYAN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.13k | £28.74k | £25.21k | £25.66k | £29.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.31k | £28.07k | £21.84k | £23.06k | £9.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH APRIL 1965 AND AMENDED 28TH APRIL 1973, 20TH APRIL 1974, 16TH APRIL 1977 AND 12TH APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE RINGING OF BELLS FOR DIVINE SERVICE. 2. TO PRACTISE RINGING TO OBTAIN A HIGHER STANDARD OF RINGING. 3. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHANGE RINGING. 4. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY WAY OF GRANTS TO AFFILIATED CHURCH AUTHORITIES INCURRING EXPENDITURE ON THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF THEIR BELLS AND BELL INSTALLATION.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Ampney Crucis
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 5SF
- Phone:
- 01285851557
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window