THE AVON CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of therapeutic riding lessons to around 300 disabled children and adults in one of the UK's largest equestrian centres purpose built for disabled riders. Set among 100 acres of fields and woodland, the Centre offers individual development, enabling clients to achieve skill and confidence in a safe, friendly and attractive environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £4,825 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
Governance
- 30 December 1980: Standard registration
- 26 February 2015: Funds received from 1072459 THE DURSTON CHARITABLE TRUST
- THE AVON RIDING CENTRE FOR THE DISABLED LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE AVON RIDING CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Vincent DipHe | Chair | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Anne Louise Heywood | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Marie Connelly | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Andrew Evans BA Cert Ed | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360.00k | £226.06k | £371.48k | £410.05k | £417.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £349.58k | £243.79k | £296.42k | £395.82k | £384.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.26k | £67.31k | £3.75k | £4.51k | £4.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1982 AND 25 JULY 2005 as amended on 08 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, HEALTH, WELLBEING AND REHABILITATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HORSE RELATED AND NATURE PROGRAMMES FOR THE COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTISE THE COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS WESTON ROAD
HENBURY
BRISTOL
BS10 7QT
- Phone:
- 01179590266
- Email:
- Info@theavoncentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window