THE ARTS SOCIETY EAST HERTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and advancement of the arts through a programme of Talks, Outings, volunteering, recording local artefacts, and financial support of the arts in local schools and other organisations. In furtherance of this purpose the Society shall have power to arrange lectures and organise appropriate activities including visits to houses, collections, museums and other places of relevant interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 January 1981: Standard registration
- E H D F A S (Working name)
- EHDFAS (Working name)
- THE EAST HERTFORDSHIRE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Gordon | Chair | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Geddes | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Fairbrass | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hanson | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bewick | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Stock | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Beverley Shelagh Geraldine Maunder-Taylor | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Juniper | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Paque | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Hampton | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jean Davis | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Sandra Wallace | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.12k | £20.14k | £15.20k | £15.08k | £21.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.41k | £12.84k | £12.38k | £12.29k | £18.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27TH NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Forge
Heacham Road
Sedgeford
HUNSTANTON
Norfolk
PE36 5LU
- Phone:
- 07766 252516
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window