Financial history GREENCOMBE GARDEN TRUST

Charity number: 281878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £11.68k £18.89k £12.02k £12.85k £11.28k
Total expenditure £39.37k £29.84k £33.82k £33.40k £28.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A