Financial history THE LANSDOWNE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 282121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.33k £3.81k £3.99k £5.96k £7.59k
Total expenditure £8.84k £6.80k £9.30k £11.63k £10.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A