HIGHWOODS PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRESERVING ANCIENT WOODLAND LEASED FROM ROTHER DISTRICT COUNCIL. THE WOODLAND IS PRESERVED AND MANAGED AS A PUBLIC AMENITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 April 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILLIAM HOY | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
James William Foster | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Edward Straker Crone | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
VERNON FINDLAY | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ASHFORD | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|||||||
JOHN HENRY THOMAS DOWLING | Trustee |
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS SIMON HOLLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALAN JAMES DENGATE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £5.14k | £5.52k | £4.50k | £7.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £3.12k | £16.95k | £2.57k | £3.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 19TH MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
(1) TO IMPROVE, PROTECT AND CONSERVE THE HIGHWOODS AND ASSOCIATED AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) TO ESTABLISH FORM, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT A NATURE RESERVE FOR THE CONSERVATION AND CONTROL OF WILD PLANTS AND OTHER VEGETATION AND OF THE WILD CREATURES ANY DESCRIPTION LIVING NATURALLY THEREIN.
Area of benefit
HIGHWOODS AND ASSOCIATED AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 Grangecourt Drive
Bexhill-on-Sea
TN39 4AZ
- Phone:
- 07523305872
- Email:
- highwoods@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window