Financial history THE ANCIENT SOCIETY OF COLLEGE YOUTHS BELL RESTORATION FUND

Charity Number: 282626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.42k £6.51k £8.00k £14.31k £7.76k
Total expenditure £1.69k £1.03k £514 £6.26k £9.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A