UNITED KINGDOM FEDERATION OF JAZZ BANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the federation shall be to advance the musical education of children throughout the United Kingdom by helping to train them in the playing of marching band instruments and by means of concerts and exhibitions at which such children may perform as bands to advance the aesthetic education of the public, promote the formation and development of childrens jazz bands throughout the UK. P
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 July 1981: Standard registration
- 14 May 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1111780 THE CHILDREN'S AIR AMBULANCE
- 14 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1039404 DEMENTIA UK
- 14 May 2024: Funds transferred to 225971 BRITISH HEART FOUNDATION
- 14 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1160024 GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S CHARITY
- U K F J B (Working name)
- UKFJB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £935 | £183 | £269 | £1.62k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £535 | £579 | £1.77k | £3.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 June 2021 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 12TH APRIL 1981 as amended on 01 Dec 2018 as amended on 01 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM BY HELPING TO TRAIN THEM IN THE PLAYING OF MARCHING BAND INSTRUMENTS AND BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH CHILDREN MAY PERFORM AS BANDS TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window