Financial history THE FINEMAN TRUST

Charity Number: 282796
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £18.49k £19.11k £19.47k £17.77k £16.67k
Total expenditure £17.71k £24.58k £27.55k £28.00k £21.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A