Financial history CAMBRIDGE ORGANISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £950 £647 £747 £734 £707
Total expenditure £370 £355 £568 £797 £753
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A