S K CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is established to further those purposes both in the United Kingdom and abroad recognised as charitable by English Law and in furtherance of Orthodox Judaism, to advance education and religion in accordance with Jewish faith and to give philanthropic aid to the Jewish needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KATZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
SARAH KATZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.25k | £356.91k | £159.12k | £256.56k | £217.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.76k | £252.59k | £252.53k | £317.73k | £271.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH JULY 1981
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 ASHTEAD ROAD
LONDON
E5 9BJ
- Phone:
- 01617981660
- Email:
- charities@haffnerhoff.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window