PARKWOOD LEISURE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parkwood Leisure Club is for over 55's. Although held in a church it is not faith-based although we do hold a Christmas and Easter service, and a harvest one. Activities include speakers on varied subjects, quizes, games, outings and parties with musical entertainment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Medway
Governance
- 18 November 1981: Standard registration
- 11 February 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1128267 AGE UK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £2.95k | £3.01k | £2.05k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £2.19k | £2.60k | £2.50k | £1.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 February 2012 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CARING MINISTRY TO BRING THE FELLOWSHIP OF MEMBERS TO AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE LOVE OF GOD AND LOVE FOR ONE ANOTHER IN CHRIST AND TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AT PARK WOOD IN THE PARISH OF SOUTH GILLINGHAM, WIGMORE, GILLINGHAM, KENT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window