THE ST BARTHOLOMEW THE GREAT HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 283623
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the Trust are the preservation and improvement of the fabric of the Priory Church of St Bartholomew the Great and the maintenance of the church, the buildings used in connection therewith, the ornaments and furnishings thereof and the services held therein.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £5,269
Total expenditure: £9,018

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF THE PRIORY CHURCH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW THE GREAT (Working name)
  • THE GUILD OF RAHERE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Holland Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Green Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
Iain David Bailey Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
George Holdaway Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Lilian Reid Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Roy Keith Sully Trustee 24 September 2018
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S GATEHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY LE STRAND WITH ST CLEMENT DANES
Received: On time
ST CLEMENT DANES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY LE STRAND WITH ST CLEMENT DANES
Received: On time
The Reverend Mark Alexander Walker Trustee 11 February 2018
GREAT ST BARTHOLOMEW MUSIC FOUNDATION
Recently registered
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S GATEHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
Geoff Cowley Trustee 22 June 2012
None on record
NICHOLAS RIDDLE Trustee
KATHLEEN FERRIER MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL SCHOOL OF CHURCH MUSIC
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £7.80k £7.74k £8.78k £3.50k £5.27k
Total expenditure £32.63k £14.20k £16.57k £118.35k £9.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH HOUSE
CLOTH FAIR
LONDON
EC1A 7JQ
Phone:
02072482294