THE HOLST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promulgation of knowledge of the works of Gustav and Imogen Holst and support of music and the other arts generally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF ARNOLD WHITTALL | Chair | 21 October 1986 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN ANDERSON | Trustee | 15 December 1999 |
|
|
||||
Peter Carter | Trustee | 17 November 1995 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JOSEPH CLEMENTS | Trustee | 15 March 1993 |
|
|
||||
NOEL MACDONALD PERITON | Trustee | 18 November 1981 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.38k | £28.12k | £22.15k | £24.66k | £30.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.75k | £119.06k | £123.82k | £119.33k | £95.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 AUGUST 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26TH NOV 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE MUSICAL WORKS OF GUSTAV HOLST BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.2) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY, KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING MUSIC, INSTRUMENTAL, VOICE AND OPERATIC ART, DRAMA, DANCING, MIME, THE VISUAL ARTS, LITERATURE AND POETRY AND TO EXTEND AND INCREASE THE APPRECIATION, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Trematon Place
TEDDINGTON
TW11 9RH
- Phone:
- 02089775921
- Email:
- pcls22486@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window