BRIGHTON FESTIVAL CHORUS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur chorus singing to professional standards. Engaged by concert promoters or puts on self-funded own promotion concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 06 April 1982: Standard registration
- 08 October 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 October 2019: Funds transferred to 1173302 BRIGHTON FESTIVAL CHORUS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.81k | £146.79k | £63.00k | £73.80k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.84k | £125.39k | £66.45k | £81.20k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 23 September 2019 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 31 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 31 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 23 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 23 May 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/11/1981 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ART AND SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window