THE DANBURY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the general charitable benefit of the inhabitants of the Danbury area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 27 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Richard Scofield | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chandra Sekhar Pyne | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Deamer | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR BOB BOOKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32k | £1.63k | £8.00k | £5.59k | £2.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £2.23k | £6.18k | £5.42k | £2.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1981 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 23 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3. TO PROTECT THE BEAUTIES OF THE COUNTRYSIDE. 4. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 5, TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL CHARITABLE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE DANBURY AREA BY PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL AND/OR MATERIAL BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
DANBURY CP
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE HAWTHORNS
DANBURY
CHELMSFORD
CM3 4RW
- Phone:
- 01245225367
- Email:
- danburysociety@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window