Financial history CAMDEN CHOIR

Charity number: 283922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.65k £10.79k £34.85k £21.31k £45.77k
Total expenditure £21.10k £4.32k £37.98k £20.09k £28.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A