CAMDEN CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and the appreciation of, the art and science of music, and in particular choral music, in all its aspects, by the presentation of public concerts, recitals and by such other means as the Choir through its committee shall determine from time to time
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 23 November 1981: Standard registration
- 28 April 2021: Funds received from 1050326 CAMDEN CHAMBER CHOIR
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON LAMB | Chair | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Margaret Jane Carter | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor John Andrew Tosh | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Penelope Cain | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Satchwell | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Wills | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM LATTIMER | Trustee | 01 September 1998 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diana Clare Briscoe | Trustee | 27 October 1980 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.53k | £17.65k | £10.79k | £34.85k | £21.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.28k | £21.10k | £4.32k | £37.98k | £20.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 23RD NOVEMBER 1981 as amended on 31 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, AND IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC, IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, RECITALS, AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 SPRINGCROFT AVENUE
LONDON
N2 9JE
- Phone:
- 02083745643
- Email:
- info@camdenchoir.london
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window