Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SALTASH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 284149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.05k £6.20k £17.22k £11.64k £14.81k
Total expenditure £9.15k £4.59k £14.47k £9.99k £13.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A