SHISHUKUNJ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides activities aimed at 6-14 year olds, primarily on Sunday mornings for 4 hours. Encompasses holistic development - physical, mental, social, cultural, spiritual development in an environment rich in positive values and family environment. Activities are run almost exclusively by youth volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 March 1982: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Funds received from 1153171 TANNA CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dipali Shah | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suraj Shah | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jayesh Dhanani | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KUSH SHAH | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chandi Gondria | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prisha Halai | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nihir Shah | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ushma Shah | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Premilaben Halai | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sahil Shah | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rakheben Lad | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vinaya Haria | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sunita Mehta | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harshiv Shah | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mehul Patel | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kajal Shah | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mahel Shah | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £476.09k | £260.25k | £295.55k | £352.35k | £369.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £450.03k | £300.98k | £272.08k | £309.38k | £408.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 23RD MARCH 1986 AND 30 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE INDIAN CULTURES AND RELIGIONS AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. (C) TO INSTRUCT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP. (D) TO RELIEVE POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25-27 High Street
Edgware
HA8 7EE
- Phone:
- 02083811818
- Email:
- office@shishukunj.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window