Financial history The Ramfield Trust

Charity number: 284229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023 01/10/2024
Total gross income £17.51k £11.79k £12.54k £6.31k £7.92k
Total expenditure £8.62k £8.45k £8.18k £6.57k £11.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A