THE SICK CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sick Children's Trust provides essential accommodation and amenities (Homes from Home) for the families and carers of sick children undergoing treatment at a number of hospitals around the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,394,347
Donations and legacies | £2.00m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £336.07k | |
Investments | £53.46k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,166,498
Raising funds | £981.84k | |
Charitable activities | £2.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £981.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.18m |
People

53 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 March 1982: Standard registration
- 01 August 2024: Funds received from 1163599 ELLIE-MAI FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mei-Lin Robertson | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Ryan | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Fennell | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Yannoulias | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kester | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Plane | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JARDINE | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
POLLY ELEANOR OLIVIA STAVELEY | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA JANE CONWAY BLAKEMORE | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER CUNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK JAMES RIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.18m | £2.04m | £1.92m | £2.40m | £2.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.55m | £2.46m | £2.41m | £3.00m | £3.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | £333.20k | £99.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.97m | £1.97m | £1.78m | £2.15m | £2.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £195.45k | £70.46k | £141.13k | £241.06k | £336.07k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.59k | £1.00k | £403 | £8.13k | £53.46k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £159.50k | £2.10k | £141.50k | £105.78k | £52.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.94m | £1.77m | £1.74m | £2.12m | £2.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £606.08k | £693.39k | £667.99k | £883.36k | £981.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.02k | £10.14k | £10.41k | £13.50k | £13.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.46m | £6.21m | £5.90m | £5.52m | £5.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.83m | £2.67m | £2.48m | £2.41m | £1.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£25.10k | -£19.96k | -£3.84k | -£1.65k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £149.37k | £153.40k | £168.94k | £335.31k | £274.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AND 22ND APRIL 1997 as amended on 07 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
(a) To help aid the recovery of seriously ill children in hospital in Great Britain and Northern Ireland by supporting the well-being of the family. (b) The Charity provides 'Home from Home' accommodation for families and carers of sick children undergoing treatment at hospitals across Great Britain and Northern Ireland. (c) To work towards a future where no child in Great Britain and Northern Ireland faces hospital alone by giving their family a place to stay, free of charge, just minutes from their bedside.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
28-30 Worship Street
London
EC2A 2AH
- Phone:
- 02076384066
- Email:
- info@sickchildrenstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window