Financial history THE BEIS MALKA TRUST

Charity number: 284447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.66m £2.75m £2.57m £3.96m £3.30m
Total expenditure £2.70m £2.65m £2.79m £3.85m £3.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £747.09k £1.14m £937.70k £1.36m £1.38m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.10m £1.23m £1.05m £1.95m £1.55m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.56m £1.52m £1.52m £2.01m £1.75m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.68m £2.63m £2.77m £3.82m £3.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.98k £13.78k £17.59k £29.22k £7.06k
Expenditure - Governance £16.40k £14.89k £29.15k £44.98k £67.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £396 £1.07k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.30k £1.55k £1.41k £0 £0