Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH HEMEL HEMPSTEAD

Charity number: 284457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £599 £552 £1.54k £4.13k £5.55k
Total expenditure £7.63k £2.40k £2.20k £4.99k £23.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A