Financial history THE SKIN CANCER RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 284582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £11.52k £17.87k £344.88k £42.00k
Total expenditure £63.00k £19.26k £8.62k £55.91k £17.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A