STROUD BERESFORD GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide safe, short-term accommodation, support and resettlement services to women and children who have experienced domestic abuse and individual tailor-made support services that aim to promote group led, peer-led support that promotes safe sustainable independent living. In 2010 Stroud Beresford Group became a company limited by guarantee - Stroud Beresford Limited - No. 1132626
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 April 1982: Standard registration
- 10 February 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 February 2012: Funds transferred to 1132626 STROUD BERESFORD LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 30/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.97k | £150.06k | £146.64k | £176.93k | £222.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.42k | £144.82k | £149.00k | £171.54k | £210.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 20 March 2009 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 20 March 2009 | 48 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED BY THEIR HUSBANDS OR BY THE MEN WITH WHOM THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN LIVING, AND AMONG THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN, BY THE PROVISION OF HOSTEL ACCOMODATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF STROUD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window