NEWBURY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage interest in organ music, not only amongst players of the instrument but amongst all with an interest in this musical genre. To hold regular monthly organ recitals by local and visiting players. To visit other organs, when possible. To host occasional recitals by national or international celebrity organists, when finances permit. To hold occasional master classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 03 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Julian Holloway | Chair | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Sears FRCO | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Oats | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANN TURNER | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Michael Thomas Cobbe | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|||||
DAPHNE GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DON BEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS ROSEMARY EVANS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN PYNN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.29k | £1.81k | £2.80k | £2.96k | £2.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £1.52k | £1.06k | £1.66k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 3RD JULY 1979
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SRUDY OF THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO LITURGICAL AND ORGAN MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Groveland Road
Speen
NEWBURY
Berkshire
RG14 1SS
- Phone:
- 0163543380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window