THE TAVISTOCK CLINIC FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation raises funds towards or for the prevention, relief, treatment or cure of sickness, ill-health or infirmity of every kind in the field of mental health, and in particular in furthering the ideas associated with the creation of the Tavistock Clinic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 August 1982: Standard registration
- 07 August 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1191405 TAVISTOCK AND PORTMAN CHARITY
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.26k | £126.73k | £26.14k | £232.55k | £181.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.10k | £136.49k | £49.07k | £1.34m | £193.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/06/1982 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/07/2014 as amended on 04 Mar 2020 as amended on 20 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
The prevention, relief, treatment and cure of sickness, ill health and infirmity of every kind in the field of mental health and the promotion of well-being and, in particular, but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing the furtherance or support of the work of the Tavistock and Portman NHS Foundation Trust in any ways which shall for the time being be charitable in law.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window