Financial history BEARWOOD COLLEGE TRUSTEES

Charity number: 285287
Charity reporting is up to date (236 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £19.08k £15.27k £13.63k £18.17k £20.00k
Total expenditure £18.79k £11.63k £12.43k £16.45k £3.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A