Trustees TOVIL SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 285408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janice Grant Chair 17 July 2021
KENT COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Kevin Hawkins Trustee 31 March 2024
None on record
Jake Samuel Hawkins Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Joy Lesley Bishop Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Kirsty Hawkins Trustee 17 July 2021
None on record
DANIEL SIMMONS Trustee 30 August 2011
None on record
GEOFFREY PAUL SAUNDERS Trustee
None on record
KEVIN JOHN JENNER Trustee
MAIDSTONE WEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time