Accounts and annual returns THE RUZIN SADAGORA TRUST

Charity number: 285475
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 May 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 May 2024 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 November 2023 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 22 November 2023 206 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 May 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 May 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window