THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S, IFIELD

Charity number: 285830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Friends of St Margaret's hold two or three small fundraising activities each year - mainly for the congregation and their friends and families. The profits are banked until such time as a need for funds arises in order for the church to improve or maintain facilities. The PCC applies to the Friends who consider giving a grant in these circumstances.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £702
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 December 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS RALPH EDWARD MISKIN Chair
THE GRAVESEND HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Linda Bodiam Trustee 20 August 2020
None on record
PEERS CARTER Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
Susan Carter Trustee 20 January 1996
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET FLINT Trustee
None on record
MAVIS EDESON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.22k £380 £1.18k £1.09k £702
Total expenditure £0 £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 January 2022 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HAYDON CROSS
DALE ROAD
SOUTHFLEET
GRAVESEND
DA13 9NX
Phone:
01474833240
Website:

No information available