THE MANNA HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since 1982 the Manna House Trust has sought to serve the community by providing access to professional counselling services, accredited courses to students training to be future counsellors and supervisors, and wellbeing workshops, for everyone in Northamptonshire irrespective of faith background or ability to pay. It has also provided a coffee shop, bookshop and flats for the homeless.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £156,495 from 11 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 February 1983: Standard registration
- THE MANNA HOUSE - THE MANNA HOUSE COUNSELLING SERVICE (Working name)
- THE NORTHAMPTON CHRISTIAN CENTRES TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victor WINCHCOMBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ivet White | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Ombui | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sturgess | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
GWYN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID VICTOR HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD PATRICK HARDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LENNOX EDMOND THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH THOMAS DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.17k | £188.52k | £208.97k | £239.73k | £326.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.59k | £155.59k | £170.07k | £201.80k | £377.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £26.25k | £54.44k | £52.76k | £75.46k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | £156.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 8TH JANUARY 1983 AND 20 MAY 2003. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, THERAPY, AND PASTORAL CARE BY PROVIDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: A) A PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING SERVICE, DELIVERED BY REGISTERED COUNSELLORS AVAILABLE TO ALL PERSONS IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RELIGION OR ETHNIC ORIGIN, BASED ON THE PRINCIPLES OF CARING, COMPASSION AND RESPECT TOWARDS ALL PEOPLE; B) ACCREDITED TRAINING COURSES TO PROSPECTIVE COUNSELLORS AND PASTORAL CARERS; C) SUPPORT AND SUPERVISION FOR THOSE ENGAGED IN PROVIDING COUNSELLING ON BEHALF OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Manna House Trust
UoN Innovation Centre
Green Street
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 1SY
- Phone:
- 01604 633304
- Email:
- mhcs@mannahouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window