Financial history THE FRIENDS OF CHILTERN OPEN-AIR MUSEUM

Charity number: 286534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £31.62k £19.36k £33.74k £35.48k £17.57k
Total expenditure £37.58k £16.55k £6.71k £34.12k £18.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A