NORWICH DIVISION GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding, as part of a worldwide Movement, enables girls and young women to fulfil their potential to take an active role in society through it's distinctive, stimulating and enjoyable programme of activities delivered by trained volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 March 1983: Standard registration
- NORWICH-CONESFORD DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- NORWICH-CONESFORD DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Victoria Lemmon | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Annison | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Barber | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Townsend | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HELEN CARTER | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Pamela Joyce Lacey | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANGELA MILBANK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN BROOKES | Trustee |
|
||||||
NORWICH DIVISION GUIDES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.62k | £2.22k | £3.21k | £17.09k | £7.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.40k | £1.99k | £1.67k | £18.90k | £6.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 December 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Patteson Activity Centre
Patteson Lodge
14 Gt. Hautbois Road
Coltishall
NORWICH
NR12 7JN
- Phone:
- 01603737996
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window