PETT LEVEL INDEPENDENT RESCUE BOAT ASSN.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an inshore rescue service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 20 September 1983: Standard registration
- PETT RESCUE (Working name)
- THE PETT LEVEL RESCUE BOAT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell John Gilbert | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Dunn | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Pulfer | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
DAVID DUNLOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HIS HONOUR BRIAN BARKER CBE KC | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BROOKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.20k | £18.84k | £53.70k | £53.77k | £81.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.23k | £28.28k | £24.37k | £38.41k | £56.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 13/03/1983 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF LIFE FROM SHIPWRECK BY THE PROVISION OF A SEA RESCUE SERVICE IN THE VICINITY OF RYE BAY.
Area of benefit
RYE BAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pett Level Lifeboat
Pett Level Road
Pett Level
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN35 4EH
- Phone:
- 01424 812457
- Email:
- plirbrescue@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window