J C J EATON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

See Charity Classification

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £10,600
Total expenditure: £3,486

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH EATON Chair
BARBARA A SHUTTLEWORTH MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
BARONESS EATON DBE DL Trustee 05 April 1983
TRACKS OF PEACE
Received: On time
COTTINGLEY TOWN HALL CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
GRETCHEN ZOE EATON Trustee
None on record
YORKE JOSEPH JOHN EATON Trustee
THE SANDY DEWHIRST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MICHAEL DEWHIRST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ALA GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.63k £11.17k £11.06k £12.65k £10.60k
Total expenditure £3.33k £3.47k £2.82k £3.58k £3.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRACKEN RIDGE
COTTINGLEY WOOD
BINGLEY
BD16 1NG
Phone:
01274565819
Website:

No information available