BRAMLEY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school (not normally provided by the Local Education Authority). Foster more extended relationships between staff, parents, community and others associated with the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 July 1983: Standard registration
- 28 July 2023: Funds received from 1080036 BRAMLEY AFTER SCHOOL CLUB
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Louise Warner | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Anderson | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.69k | £15.84k | £19.31k | £12.89k | £23.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.90k | £14.75k | £8.09k | £20.11k | £6.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 September 2021 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH MARCH 1983, 17/10/2000 AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ; (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN THE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
BRAMLEY AND SHERFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRAMLEY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
BRAMLEY LANE
BRAMLEY
TADLEY
RG26 5AH
- Phone:
- 01256881339
- Email:
- BSALINK@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window