BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BVA AWF is the veterinary profession's own charity which aims to improve the welfare of animals through veterinary science, education and debate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 July 1997: Standard registration
- ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Malcolm James Morley | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Burn | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justine Claire Ruth Shotton | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Romain Pizzi | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Deidre Marie Carson | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Kathryn Amanda Mellor | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Catherine Fell | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Clive Dobbs | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jayne Schofield | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Arnold Martin Kupfer | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.03k | £133.03k | £125.37k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.28k | £184.28k | £334.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/05/1983 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/12/2011
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN VETERINARY SCIENCE MEDICINE SURGERY AND ANIMAL WELFARE. (B) RESEARCH AND SUPPORT IN ANIMAL WELFARE OR ANY OTHER FIELD OF VETERINARY ENDEAVOUR AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING IN ANIMALS AND THE PROTECTION OF SUCH ANIMALS. (D) ANY OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH VETERINARY SCIENCE OR ANIMALS AND THEIR WELFARE AS SHALL FURTHER ANY OF THE OBJECTS OF THIS TRUST AS HEREINBEFORE DECLARED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 29 July 1997 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
B V A ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION
7 MANSFIELD STREET
LONDON
W1G 9NQ
- Phone:
- 02076366541
- Website:
-
animalwelfarefoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window